open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-05350
    Party Name:Ronald Clark v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Preclude]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to Motion]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?714072
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =