open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04286
    Party Name:Bryan Barello v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Answers to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amendment (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder (Motion Related)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?711194
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =