open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-06555
    Party Name:Christopher Hornshaw v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Bifurcate]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine - Exclude]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?718350
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =