open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-06840
    Party Name:Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles et al v. City of Beverly Hills et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?719346
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =