open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-07247
    Party Name:Austin Norman Truong v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?720088
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =