open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-07522
    Party Name:Estate of Cesar Rodriguez et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?721258
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =