open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-07842
    Party Name:Jose Martinez v. City of Glendale et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause Hearing - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?722388
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =