open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-08110
    Party Name:Ronald W. Pelham v. City of Monrovia
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?723378
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =