open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-08896
    Party Name:Geoffrey Sommer v. City of Redondo Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?725754
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =