open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-09014
    Party Name:Antonio Fernandez v. City of Pico Rivera et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?726257
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =