open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-09022
    Party Name:Tina Foafoa v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?726305
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =