open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-09822
    Party Name:Remi Hamilton et al v. City of Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Shorten Time for Hearing]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?729512
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =