open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-10167
    Party Name:Vladimir Tsipursky et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?730710
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =