open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-10377
    Party Name:Jonathon Wellman et al v. City of Gardena et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?731394
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =