open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-10486
    Party Name:Sophia Larios v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?731731
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =