open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00370
    Party Name:Christian Moreno et al v. City of West Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?734110
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =