open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-ap-01045-WB
    Party Name:Old Firehouse of Pomona, LLC v. 100 E. Alvarado St LLC
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Opposition]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status report]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdrawal re:]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Case for Abuse and Notice of Motion (BNC) (motion)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Lodgment]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proof of service]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Case Reassigned (Manual)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1852894
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =