open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00912
    Party Name:Jerry L. Cooch v. City of Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?736121
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =