open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01273
    Party Name:Chris Langer v. Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737534
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =