open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01385
    Party Name:Juanita Franco et al v. City of West Covina
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737984
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =