open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03588
    Party Name:City of El Monte et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand Case to State Court]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?744891
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =