open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-08663
    Party Name:Perryiona Gales v. City of Long Beach, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions on Discovery Matters]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions on Discovery Matter]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Deposition]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?695499
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =