open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04019
    Party Name:Floyd McLucas v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?745982
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =