open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04251
    Party Name:In Re: 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposit Funds]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?746780
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =