open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04314
    Party Name:Jelani Bonilla v. City of Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?746962
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =