open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05055
    Party Name:Antonio Fernandez v. Tom Paziouros et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?749467
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =