open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05462
    Party Name:Liping Zhu v. City of South El Monte et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750706
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =