open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:19-02076
    Party Name:Hat v. San Joaquin County
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Matter Held *]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Service of Document (Certificate)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Matter Continued *]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Audio Docket Entry]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry - CM - Reissued Summons]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reissued Summons]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Filing Fee Paid]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BDRP]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [EFILED RECEIPT - Adversary Fee Paid]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order to Confer]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint (Intake)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?630525
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =