open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05929
    Party Name:Christopher Williams v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel Deposition]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to Motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bifurcate]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?752151
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =