open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05996
    Party Name:Charles Murata v. The Congregational Church of Chatsworth et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?752328
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =