open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-06769
    Party Name:Antranik Minassian et al v. City of Montebello et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?754634
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =