open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-07768
    Party Name:Deanna Wolfe v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?758202
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =