open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-08236
    Party Name:Ronnie Brown v. City of Hawthorne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?759422
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =