open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-08281
    Party Name:Kevin Lee Howard v. City of West Covina et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?759566
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =