open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-08518
    Party Name:Crown Castle Fiber LLC v. The City of Glendale et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extending Answer Due Deadline]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?760509
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =