open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-08861
    Party Name:Better Housing for Long Beach et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?761645
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =