open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:5:19-cv-02009
    Party Name:Christopher Lisner v. City of Huntington Park et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minutes]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?762090
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =