open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-09430
    Party Name:VienPhuong Ti Ho v. The City of Long Beach, Public Works et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit (non-trial)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?763566
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =