open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-09575
    Party Name:Kirk Goltermann et al v. City of San Gabriel
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?764033
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =