open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00279
    Party Name:Jin Lee v. Good Fortune Supermarket Of San Gabriel, LP et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?769483
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =