open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01445
    Party Name:Chris Langer v. Coffee Coffee LA LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk to Enter Default]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?773053
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =