open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:1:20-bk-10677-DS
    Party Name:Malibu California Model Drug Treatment Center, Inc
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice of Substantial Consummation]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Distribution (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Compensation (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Status report]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Brief]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Proof of service]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Compensation (motion)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Summary of ballots]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Declaration re: non opposition]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Hearing Set (Other)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Ombudsman Report]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Stipulation (motion)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Employ (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Reply]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Opposition]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Monthly Operating Report]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [X - Motion (Generic) (motion)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Employ (motion)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Use Cash Collateral (motion)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [X - Application (Generic) (RE: Application) (BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Emergency motion (motion)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice of Lodgment]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [X - Application (Generic) (motion)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (motion)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [List of Equity Security Holders]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Statement]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [Notice]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Sharf, (TR) Mark M [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Other)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corp Resolution Auth Filing]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1895733
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =