U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meiser
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bond and Conditions (CR-1)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
  • April 20, 2025: [Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA]
  • April 19, 2025: [Memorandum by PSA Officer for Release Order Authorization]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Designation and Appearance of Counsel (CR-14)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration re Passport (CR-37)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest on Indictment - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form]
  • April 14, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.