U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50526
  • Case Name: Christopher Allan Duenas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Order Re Ch 13 Plan and Adequate Protection Payments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Compensation]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [none]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Derham-Burk, Devin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.