U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Central District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Designation and Appearance of Counsel (CR-14)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Passport Receipt]
  • April 24, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration re Passport (CR-37)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest on Indictment - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Summary (CR-72)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.