U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-01177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oceguera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Consent to Plea]
  • May 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (w/ Schedules)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Compel Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preserve Evidence]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Further Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Abstract of Order for Material Witness]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witness]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Material Witness Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.