U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-01172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero-Cantor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Abstract of Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentence Without PSR]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [~ .English]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplemental Sentencing Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.