U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-01187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alcala-Benitez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing Summary Chart]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Summary Chart]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Consent to Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Lodgment of Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.