U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-01181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Abstract of Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Bond - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Further Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preserve Evidence]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.