U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

california Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of California
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-01199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chaidez-Guerro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing (w/ Schedules)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Preserve Evidence]
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Further Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment (w/ Schedules)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.